Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/25/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/25/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/07/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/07/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/21/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/10/2012