Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 04/26/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/26/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/26/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/08/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/16/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/21/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/04/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/04/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/11/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/12/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/13/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/19/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/26/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/09/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/10/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/12/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/16/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/18/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/25/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/02/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/10/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 09/20/2012