Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 04/26/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/26/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/16/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/04/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/11/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/12/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/13/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/26/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/12/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/25/2012