Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/07/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/28/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/02/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/24/2012