Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/01/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/03/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/14/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/29/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/22/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/25/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/06/2011