Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/26/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/11/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/26/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/30/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/19/2012