Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/01/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/28/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/01/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/02/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/29/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/05/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/28/2011