Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/07/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/07/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/07/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/07/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/07/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/07/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/08/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/08/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/09/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/16/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/23/2012