Text: S.270 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-164 (08/10/2012)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 164]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 126 STAT. 1279]]

Public Law 112-164
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain Federal land 
    to Deschutes County, Oregon. <<NOTE: Aug. 10, 2012 -  [S. 270]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: La Pine Land 
Conveyance Act.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``La Pine Land Conveyance Act''.
SEC. 2. DEFINITIONS.

    In this Act:
            (1) City.--The term ``City'' means the City of La Pine, 
        Oregon.
            (2) County.--The term ``County'' means the County of 
        Deschutes, Oregon.
            (3) Map.--The term ``map'' means the map entitled ``La Pine, 
        Oregon Land Transfer'' and dated December 11, 2009.
            (4) Secretary.--The term ``Secretary'' means the Secretary 
        of the Interior, acting through the Director of the Bureau of 
        Land Management.
SEC. 3. CONVEYANCES OF LAND.

    (a) In General.--As soon as practicable after the date of enactment 
of this Act, subject to valid existing rights and the provisions of this 
Act, and notwithstanding the land use planning requirements of sections 
202 and 203 of the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 (43 
U.S.C. 1712, 1713), the Secretary shall convey to the City or County, 
without consideration, all right, title, and interest of the United 
States in and to each parcel of land described in subsection (b) for 
which the City or County has submitted to the Secretary a request for 
conveyance by the date that is not later than 1 year after the date of 
enactment of this Act.
    (b) Description of Land.--The parcels of land referred to in 
subsection (a) consist of--
            (1) the approximately 150 acres of land managed by the 
        Bureau of Land Management, Prineville District, Oregon, depicted 
        on the map as ``parcel A'', to be conveyed to the County, which 
        is subject to a right-of-way retained by the Bureau of Land 
        Management for a power substation and transmission line;
            (2) the approximately 750 acres of land managed by the 
        Bureau of Land Management, Prineville District, Oregon, depicted 
        on the map as ``parcel B'', to be conveyed to the County; and

[[Page 126 STAT. 1280]]

            (3) the approximately 10 acres of land managed by the Bureau 
        of Land Management, Prineville District, Oregon, depicted on the 
        map as ``parcel C'', to be conveyed to the City.

    (c) Availability of Map.--The map shall be on file and available for 
public inspection in the appropriate offices of the Bureau of Land 
Management.
    (d) Use of Conveyed Land.--
            (1) In general.--Consistent with the Act of June 14, 1926 
        (commonly known as the ``Recreation and Public Purposes Act'') 
        (43 U.S.C. 869 et seq.), the land conveyed under subsection (a) 
        shall be used for the following public purposes and associated 
        uses:
                    (A) The parcel described in subsection (b)(1) shall 
                be used for outdoor recreation, open space, or public 
                parks, including a rodeo ground.
                    (B) The parcel described in subsection (b)(2) shall 
                be used for a public sewer system.
                    (C) The parcel described in subsection (b)(3) shall 
                be used for a public library, public park, or open 
                space.
            (2) Additional terms and conditions.--The Secretary may 
        require such additional terms and conditions for the conveyances 
        under subsection (a) as the Secretary determines to be 
        appropriate to protect the interests of the United States.

    (e) Administrative Costs.--The Secretary shall require the County to 
pay all survey costs and other administrative costs associated with the 
conveyances to the County under this Act.
    (f) Reversion.--If the land conveyed under subsection (a) ceases to 
be used for the public purpose for which the land was conveyed, the land 
shall, at the discretion of the Secretary, revert to the United States.

    Approved August 10, 2012.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 270:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 112-581 (Comm. on Natural Resources).
SENATE REPORTS: No. 112-49 (Comm. on Energy and Natural Resources).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 157 (2011):
                                    Oct. 18, considered and passed 
                                        Senate.
                                                        Vol. 158 (2012):
                                    July 31, Aug. 1, considered and 
                                        passed House.

                                  <all>