Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/03/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/07/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/10/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/10/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/10/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/10/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/10/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 02/10/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/10/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/10/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/10/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/10/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 02/10/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/10/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/10/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/10/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/10/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/14/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/14/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/14/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/14/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/17/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/31/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/09/2011