Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/03/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/10/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 02/10/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/10/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/10/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/14/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/17/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/17/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/03/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/29/2011