Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/08/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/08/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/09/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/12/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/28/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/28/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/16/2012