Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/29/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/21/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 12/21/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/27/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/27/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/27/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/27/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/27/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 12/27/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/28/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 12/28/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 12/28/2012