Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/22/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/06/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/06/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/06/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/06/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/06/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/06/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/06/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/06/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/06/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/06/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/07/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/07/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/07/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/07/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/07/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/07/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/07/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/11/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/12/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/12/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/12/2012