Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/15/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/17/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/17/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/17/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/23/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/23/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 05/23/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/23/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/23/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/23/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/23/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/23/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/23/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/23/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/23/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/23/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/23/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/23/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/23/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/23/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/24/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/11/2012