Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/10/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/05/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/06/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/17/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/30/2012