Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/08/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/08/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 02/08/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/08/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/14/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/05/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/12/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/17/2012