Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/21/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/05/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/10/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/11/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/11/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/03/2012