Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/26/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/10/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/17/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/19/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 12/20/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/20/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/21/2012