Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/24/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/04/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/06/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/07/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/28/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/17/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/24/2012