Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/17/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/24/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/24/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/04/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/07/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/11/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/12/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/13/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/18/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/18/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/18/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/25/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/26/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/27/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/27/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/28/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/10/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/10/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/11/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/11/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/11/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/12/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/16/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/17/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/17/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/17/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/17/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/18/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/18/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/18/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/25/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/25/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/25/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/25/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/25/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/25/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/25/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/25/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/25/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 07/25/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/25/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/25/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/25/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/26/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/26/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/30/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/30/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/31/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 08/01/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 08/01/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 08/01/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/01/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 08/01/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/02/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/11/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/13/2012