Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/22/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 05/22/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/22/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/22/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 05/22/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/22/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/22/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/22/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/22/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/23/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/04/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/04/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/04/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/05/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/06/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/07/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/18/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/18/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/25/2012