Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/23/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/16/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/14/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/14/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/26/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/03/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 12/13/2012