Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/24/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/13/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/14/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/18/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/18/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/20/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/10/2012