Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/04/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/04/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/05/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/06/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/11/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/11/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/11/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/11/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/11/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/11/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/24/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/26/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/19/2012