Limit your search

1-25 of 304
  1. S.Amdt.2460   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/19/2012)
  2. S.Amdt.2459   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 06/19/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2457   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve access to broadband telecommunication services in rural areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2457 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4341-4343)
  4. S.Amdt.2456   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2456, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 48. Record Vote Number: 158.
  5. S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  6. S.Amdt.2454   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit assistance to North Korea under title II of the Food for Peace Act unless the President issues a national interest waiver.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2454 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 144.
  7. S.Amdt.2453   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide assistance for certain losses.
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2453 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  8. S.Amdt.2452   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  9. S.Amdt.2451   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  10. S.Amdt.2450 to S.Amdt.2294   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  11. S.Amdt.2449 to S.Amdt.2348   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  12. S.Amdt.2448 to S.Amdt.2347   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  13. S.Amdt.2447   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  14. S.Amdt.2446 to S.Amdt.2172   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  15. S.Amdt.2445   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To strengthen rural communities and foster the next generation of farmers and ranchers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2445 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 44. Record Vote Number: 126.
  16. S.Amdt.2444   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  17. S.Amdt.2443   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve farm safety at the local level.
    Sponsor: Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2443 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  18. S.Amdt.2442   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish a pilot loan program to support healthy foods for the hungry.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2442 agreed to in Senate by Division Vote.
  19. S.Amdt.2441   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  20. S.Amdt.2440   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve a provision relating to loans to purchasers of highly fractionated land.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2440 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  21. S.Amdt.2439   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To limit the amount of premium subsidy provided by the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation on behalf of any person or legal entity with an average adjusted gross income in excess of $750,000 with a delayed application of the limitation until completion of a study on the effects of the limitation.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2439 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 66 - 33. Record Vote Number: 157.
  22. S.Amdt.2438   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish highly erodible land and wetland conservation compliance requirements for the Federal crop insurance program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2438 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 155.
  23. S.Amdt.2437   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To limit the amount of premium subsidy provided by the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation on behalf of any person or legal entity with an average adjusted gross income in excess of $750,000, with a delayed application of the limitation until completion of a study on the effects of the limitation.
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2437 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 55. Record Vote Number: 156.
  24. S.Amdt.2436   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  25. S.Amdt.2435   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/14/2012)