Limit your search

1-25 of 125
  1. S.Amdt.2460   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/19/2012)
  2. S.Amdt.2459   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 06/19/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2457   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve access to broadband telecommunication services in rural areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2457 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4341-4343)
  4. S.Amdt.2456   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2456, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 48. Record Vote Number: 158.
  5. S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  6. S.Amdt.2454   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit assistance to North Korea under title II of the Food for Peace Act unless the President issues a national interest waiver.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2454 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 144.
  7. S.Amdt.2453   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide assistance for certain losses.
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2453 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  8. S.Amdt.2447   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  9. S.Amdt.2446 to S.Amdt.2172   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  10. S.Amdt.2445   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To strengthen rural communities and foster the next generation of farmers and ranchers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2445 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 44. Record Vote Number: 126.
  11. S.Amdt.2442   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish a pilot loan program to support healthy foods for the hungry.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2442 agreed to in Senate by Division Vote.
  12. S.Amdt.2441   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
  13. S.Amdt.2440   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve a provision relating to loans to purchasers of highly fractionated land.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2440 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  14. S.Amdt.2439   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To limit the amount of premium subsidy provided by the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation on behalf of any person or legal entity with an average adjusted gross income in excess of $750,000 with a delayed application of the limitation until completion of a study on the effects of the limitation.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2439 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 66 - 33. Record Vote Number: 157.
  15. S.Amdt.2436   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  16. S.Amdt.2435   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  17. S.Amdt.2431   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  18. S.Amdt.2430   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  19. S.Amdt.2429   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve the livestock forage disaster program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2429 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  20. S.Amdt.2428   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  21. S.Amdt.2427   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To support State and tribal government efforts to promote research and education related to maple syrup production, natural resource sustainability in the maple syrup industry, market promotion of maple products, and greater access to lands containing maple trees for maple-sugaring activities, and for other purposes.
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2427 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  22. S.Amdt.2426   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide for studies on the feasibility of establishing a business disruption insurance policy for poultry producers and a catastrophic event insurance policy for poultry producers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2426 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  23. S.Amdt.2425   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  24. S.Amdt.2422   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To modify a provision relating to conservation innovation grants and payments.
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/13/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2422 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  25. S.Amdt.2420   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/13/2012)