Limit your search

1-9 of 9
  1. S.Amdt.2386   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.2324   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.2310   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To permit States to require that any food, beverage, or other edible product offered for sale have a label on indicating that the food, beverage, or other edible product contains a genetically engineered ingredient.
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2310, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 26 - 73. Record Vote Number: 161.
  4. S.Amdt.2258   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.2257   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.2256   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.2255   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  8. S.Amdt.2254   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve the community wood energy programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2254 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  9. S.Amdt.2253   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3