Limit your search

1-25 of 169
  • S.Amdt.2452   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2451   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2450 to S.Amdt.2294   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2449 to S.Amdt.2348   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2448 to S.Amdt.2347   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2444   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2443   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve farm safety at the local level.
    Sponsor: Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2443 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2438   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To establish highly erodible land and wetland conservation compliance requirements for the Federal crop insurance program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2438 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 155.
  • S.Amdt.2437   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To limit the amount of premium subsidy provided by the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation on behalf of any person or legal entity with an average adjusted gross income in excess of $750,000, with a delayed application of the limitation until completion of a study on the effects of the limitation.
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2437 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 55. Record Vote Number: 156.
  • S.Amdt.2434   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2433   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reform the sugar program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2433 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 151.
  • S.Amdt.2432   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To repeal mandatory funding for the farmers market and local food promotion program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2432 not agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2424   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2423   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2421   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.2419   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2410 to S.Amdt.2186   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2405   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2404   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2403   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To increase the minimum level of nonemergency food assistance.
    Sponsor: Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2403 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2402   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2394   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2387   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2383   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2380   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0