Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.2425   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.2312   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.2295   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To increase the amounts authorized to be appropriated for the designation of treatment areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2295 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 22. Record Vote Number: 146.
  4. S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
  5. S.Amdt.2203   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  6. S.Amdt.2202   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve agricultural land easements.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2202 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  7. S.Amdt.2199   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To repeal a duplicative program relating to inspection and grading of catfish.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2199 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.