Limit your search

1-14 of 14
  • S.Amdt.2452   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2430   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
  • S.Amdt.2310   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To permit States to require that any food, beverage, or other edible product offered for sale have a label on indicating that the food, beverage, or other edible product contains a genetically engineered ingredient.
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2310, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 26 - 73. Record Vote Number: 161.
  • S.Amdt.2306   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 9
  • S.Amdt.2295   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To increase the amounts authorized to be appropriated for the designation of treatment areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2295 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 22. Record Vote Number: 146.
  • S.Amdt.2253   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.2236   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
  • S.Amdt.2209   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2208   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2207   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2205   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2188   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
  • S.Amdt.2187   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To extend eligibility for certain emergency loans to commercial fishermen.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2187 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.