Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.2414   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 4
  2. S.Amdt.2325   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
  3. S.Amdt.2287   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To modify a provision relating to a high-priority research and extension initiatives.
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2287 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  4. S.Amdt.2247   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reduce unnecessary paperwork burdens on community water systems.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2247, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 58 - 41. Record Vote Number: 160.
  5. S.Amdt.2240   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
  6. S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
  7. S.Amdt.2165   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8