Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  2. S.Amdt.2426   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide for studies on the feasibility of establishing a business disruption insurance policy for poultry producers and a catastrophic event insurance policy for poultry producers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2426 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  3. S.Amdt.2425   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  4. S.Amdt.2367   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
  5. S.Amdt.2309   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require a study into the feasibility of an insurance product that covers food safety recalls.
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2309 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 76 - 23. Record Vote Number: 133.
  6. S.Amdt.2219   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  7. S.Amdt.2162   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/06/2012)