Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.2457   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve access to broadband telecommunication services in rural areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2457 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4341-4343)
  2. S.Amdt.2367   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 12
  3. S.Amdt.2301 to S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.2203   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  5. S.Amdt.2202   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve agricultural land easements.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2202 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  6. S.Amdt.2199   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To repeal a duplicative program relating to inspection and grading of catfish.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2199 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  7. S.Amdt.2165   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8