Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  • S.Amdt.2426   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide for studies on the feasibility of establishing a business disruption insurance policy for poultry producers and a catastrophic event insurance policy for poultry producers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2426 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2382   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation to provide crop insurance for organic crops under similar terms and conditions to crop insurance provided for other crops.
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2382 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 63 - 36. Record Vote Number: 140.
  • S.Amdt.2306   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 9
  • S.Amdt.2287   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To modify a provision relating to a high-priority research and extension initiatives.
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2287 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11