Limit your search

1-11 of 11
  1. S.Amdt.2425   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.2395   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.2370   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To encourage the purchase of pulse crop products for school meals programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2370 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 58 - 41. Record Vote Number: 128.
  4. S.Amdt.2367   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 12
  5. S.Amdt.2302   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  6. S.Amdt.2299   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Secretary of Agriculture and Secretary of Transportation to conduct a study on rural transportation issues.
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2299 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  7. S.Amdt.2241   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.2240   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
  9. S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
  10. S.Amdt.2224   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  11. S.Amdt.2175   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1