Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  • S.Amdt.2430   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
  • S.Amdt.2362   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 10
  • S.Amdt.2295   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To increase the amounts authorized to be appropriated for the designation of treatment areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2295 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 22. Record Vote Number: 146.
  • S.Amdt.2259   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.2242   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To amend section 520 of the Housing Act of 1949 to revise the census data and population requirements for areas to be considered as rural areas for purposes of such Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 4
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2242 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2170   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.2167   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide payment limitations for marketing loan gains and loan deficiency payments.
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2167 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 75 - 24. Record Vote Number: 125.