Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.2457   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve access to broadband telecommunication services in rural areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2457 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4341-4343)
  2. S.Amdt.2435   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2311   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  4. S.Amdt.2199   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To repeal a duplicative program relating to inspection and grading of catfish.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2199 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  5. S.Amdt.2160   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
  6. S.Amdt.2159   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 06/06/2012)