Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.2413   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.2306   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 9
  3. S.Amdt.2252   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 12
  4. S.Amdt.2219   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  5. S.Amdt.2188   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
  6. S.Amdt.2187   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To extend eligibility for certain emergency loans to commercial fishermen.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2187 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  7. S.Amdt.2162   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 12
  8. S.Amdt.2156   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike a reduction in the supplemental nutrition assistance program and increase funding for the fresh fruit and vegetable program, with an offset that limits crop insurance reimbursements to providers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2156 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 33 - 66. Record Vote Number: 135. (text as modified: CR S4277-4278)