Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.2454   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit assistance to North Korea under title II of the Food for Peace Act unless the President issues a national interest waiver.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2454 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 144.
  2. S.Amdt.2433   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reform the sugar program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2433 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 151.
  3. S.Amdt.2300   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.2221   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.2159   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 7