Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  2. S.Amdt.2447   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 06/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.2365   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.2289   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reduce funding for the market access program and to prohibit the use of funds for reality television shows, wine tastings, animal spa products, and cat or dog food.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2289 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 30 - 69. Record Vote Number: 142.
  5. S.Amdt.2216   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.2214   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to prohibit the use of public funds for political party conventions, and to provide for the return of previously distributed funds for deficit reduction.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2214, under the order of 6/18/2012, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 4. Record Vote Number: 162.