Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  • S.Amdt.2413   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.2366   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Risk Management Agency and the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation to use plain language and a website to make crop insurance more accessible.
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2366 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2362   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 10
  • S.Amdt.2295   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To increase the amounts authorized to be appropriated for the designation of treatment areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2295 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 22. Record Vote Number: 146.
  • S.Amdt.2253   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.2252   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 12
  • S.Amdt.2220   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.2156   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike a reduction in the supplemental nutrition assistance program and increase funding for the fresh fruit and vegetable program, with an offset that limits crop insurance reimbursements to providers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2156 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 33 - 66. Record Vote Number: 135. (text as modified: CR S4277-4278)