Limit your search

1-4 of 4
  • S.Amdt.2367   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 12
  • S.Amdt.2355   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To support the dissemination of objective and scholarly agricultural and food law research and information.
    Sponsor: Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2355 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2325   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
  • S.Amdt.2247   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reduce unnecessary paperwork burdens on community water systems.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2247, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 58 - 41. Record Vote Number: 160.