Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  • S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  • S.Amdt.2251   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2247   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reduce unnecessary paperwork burdens on community water systems.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2247, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 58 - 41. Record Vote Number: 160.
  • S.Amdt.2165   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
  • S.Amdt.2162   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 12