Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  • S.Amdt.2457   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve access to broadband telecommunication services in rural areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2457 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4341-4343)
  • S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  • S.Amdt.2435   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.2433   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reform the sugar program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2433 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 151.
  • S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
  • S.Amdt.2199   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To repeal a duplicative program relating to inspection and grading of catfish.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2199 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.