Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.2453   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide assistance for certain losses.
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2453 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  2. S.Amdt.2382   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation to provide crop insurance for organic crops under similar terms and conditions to crop insurance provided for other crops.
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2382 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 63 - 36. Record Vote Number: 140.
  3. S.Amdt.2323   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.2319   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.2318   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.2247   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To reduce unnecessary paperwork burdens on community water systems.
    Sponsor: Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2247, under the order of 6/18/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 58 - 41. Record Vote Number: 160.
  7. S.Amdt.2244   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1