Limit your search

1-13 of 13
  • S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  • S.Amdt.2430   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/14/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
  • S.Amdt.2429   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve the livestock forage disaster program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 06/14/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2429 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2382   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation to provide crop insurance for organic crops under similar terms and conditions to crop insurance provided for other crops.
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2382 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 63 - 36. Record Vote Number: 140.
  • S.Amdt.2373   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 5
  • S.Amdt.2362   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
    Cosponsors: 10
  • S.Amdt.2308   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2259   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.2248   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2242   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To amend section 520 of the Housing Act of 1949 to revise the census data and population requirements for areas to be considered as rural areas for purposes of such Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 4
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2242 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2203   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.2202   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve agricultural land easements.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2202 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2170   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3