Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  2. S.Amdt.2396   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To establish the Office of Tribal Relations in the Office of the Secretary of Agriculture.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2396 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  3. S.Amdt.2302   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.2295   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To increase the amounts authorized to be appropriated for the designation of treatment areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2295 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 22. Record Vote Number: 146.
  5. S.Amdt.2232   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
    Cosponsors: 11