Limit your search

1-11 of 11
  1. S.Amdt.2353   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
  2. S.Amdt.2352   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2293   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To limit subsidies for millionaires.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2293 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 62 - 37. Record Vote Number: 143.
  4. S.Amdt.2292   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  5. S.Amdt.2291   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  6. S.Amdt.2290   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  7. S.Amdt.2289   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To reduce funding for the market access program and to prohibit the use of funds for reality television shows, wine tastings, animal spa products, and cat or dog food.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2289 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 30 - 69. Record Vote Number: 142.
  8. S.Amdt.2288   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  9. S.Amdt.2225   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  10. S.Amdt.2214   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to prohibit the use of public funds for political party conventions, and to provide for the return of previously distributed funds for deficit reduction.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2214, under the order of 6/18/2012, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 4. Record Vote Number: 162.
  11. S.Amdt.2186   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/06/2012)