Limit your search

1-25 of 28
  1. S.Amdt.2419   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/13/2012)
  2. S.Amdt.2394   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2374   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
  4. S.Amdt.2286   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  5. S.Amdt.2285   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  6. S.Amdt.2284   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  7. S.Amdt.2283   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  8. S.Amdt.2282   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  9. S.Amdt.2281   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  10. S.Amdt.2280   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  11. S.Amdt.2279   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  12. S.Amdt.2278   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  13. S.Amdt.2277   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  14. S.Amdt.2276   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit mandatory or compulsory check off programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2276 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 20 - 79. Record Vote Number: 138.
  15. S.Amdt.2275   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  16. S.Amdt.2274   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  17. S.Amdt.2273   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To eliminate the authority of the Secretary to increase the amount of grants provided to eligible entities relating to providing access to broadband telecommunications services in rural areas.
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2273 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 55. Record Vote Number: 141.
  18. S.Amdt.2272   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  19. S.Amdt.2271   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  20. S.Amdt.2270   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  21. S.Amdt.2269   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  22. S.Amdt.2268   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit the Secretary from making loan guarantees.
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2268 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 14 - 84. Record Vote Number: 137.
  23. S.Amdt.2267   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  24. S.Amdt.2266   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  25. S.Amdt.2265   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 06/11/2012)